|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 646, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 28. Page 6754.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 3733.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3305.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3306.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Coms. on L. & I.R. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|