04/12/2010 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/07/2010 | Set for hearing April 20. | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/19/2010 | Set for hearing April 13. | |||
03/18/2010 | Set for hearing April 20. Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/17/2010 | Set for hearing April 13. Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/20/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |