|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 647, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 5068.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 6824.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on ED. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on ED. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Coms. on PUB. S. and ED.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 9. Page 3520.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3499.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3309.)
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Coms. on ED. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|