|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 493, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 4664.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 24. Page 6231.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6101.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (Heard in Committee on June 14.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 3411.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3311.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|