|
09/27/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 6667.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Ma.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (Heard in Committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
To Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 8. Page 3277.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3301.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on F. & A.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on F. & A.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|