|
08/13/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
To Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3474.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3428.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3181.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|