|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 563, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2759.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1010.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 678.)
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 340.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
To Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|