|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 525, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4652.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6180.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3706.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2010
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3466.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|