LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1333
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1333
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1333
Compare Versions
SB1333 Chaptered September 27, 2010
SB1333 Enrolled August 13, 2010
SB1333 Amended May 17, 2010
SB1333 Amended April 26, 2010
SB1333 Amended April 12, 2010
SB1333 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB1333 Chaptered September 27, 2010
SB1333 Enrolled August 13, 2010
SB1333 Amended May 17, 2010
SB1333 Amended April 26, 2010
SB1333 Amended April 12, 2010
SB1333 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare