|
09/29/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 6253.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Heard in committee on June 21.)
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on Nat. Res. and then back to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on W.,P. & W. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 3724.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3163.)
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|