|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 694, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4659.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6234.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6173.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3324.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3310.)
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|