02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/15/2010 | Set for hearing January 19. | |||
01/13/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2665.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
12/17/2009 | Set for hearing January 12. | |||
04/08/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/24/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/19/2009 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
02/23/2009 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/11/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 13. | |||
02/10/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |