|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 649, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 5009.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 4985.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4934.) Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6644.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 6671.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Reconsideration waived.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.) Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6536.) To third reading. Motion to reconsider the adoption of amendments made by Calderon.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6426.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5803.)
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 4. Page 3652.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3499.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3300.)
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3104.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|