|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 112, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5852.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 21.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on B. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. (Heard in Committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and B. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3415.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3292.)
|
|
|
|
04/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3103.) Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|