California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1345 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 13, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2010

Amended

Bill May 11, 2010
Bill April 20, 2010