California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1349 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2010

Amended

Bill June 24, 2010
Bill May 28, 2010
Bill April 13, 2010