|
08/19/2010
|
Motion failed in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 1. Page 4742.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Set for hearing August 19.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on EQ. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4536.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6180.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 0. Page 3586.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3301.)
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3181.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|