|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 557, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4450.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6056.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (Heard in Committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
To Coms. on HUM. S. and ED.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3414.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3162.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3016.) Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|