|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 495, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 4902.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 6533.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6174.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3741.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3594.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2010
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3444.)
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|