06/28/2010 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | |||
06/22/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/13/2010 | To Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and JUD. | |||
04/22/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/22/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 4. Page 3275.) To Assembly. | |||
04/19/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
04/15/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 3185.) | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/01/2010 | Set for hearing April 13. | |||
03/11/2010 | Set for hearing March 23. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on JUD. | |||
02/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |