05/17/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/20/2010 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3310.) | |||
04/12/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/12/2010 | Set for hearing April 20. | |||
03/11/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/09/2010 | Set for hearing April 13. | |||
03/04/2010 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |