|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 331, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 4902.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6510.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6430.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
To Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 3376.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3335.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3084.)
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|