|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 526, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2010
|
To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Correctly enrolled. Held at Desk pursuant to Joint Rule 57.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4652.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6180.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3541.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be placed on Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3304.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|