02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/28/2009 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/04/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/28/2009 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
04/27/2009 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/23/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 638.) | |||
04/14/2009 | Set for hearing April 22. | |||
04/02/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
03/31/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/23/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/11/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 13. | |||
02/10/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |