|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 292, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5108.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 3. Page 6929.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 23.)
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6260.) To third reading. Re-referred to Com. On TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 47. Noes 22. Page 6184.) Placed on third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 14.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3481.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be placed on Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3311.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|