|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 332, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. To unfinished business. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 4649.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 7. Page 6253.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3697.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3298.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|