California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1380 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2010

Amended

Bill August 16, 2010
Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 22, 2010
Bill April 28, 2010
Bill April 15, 2010