|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 705, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
In Senate. Re-referred to Com. on APPR pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 5. Page 5130.) Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 5118.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 18. Page 6937.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. On ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6774.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6430.) To third reading. (August amended measure version corrected August 26.)
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 4. Page 3727.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 3675.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3184.)
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|