|
06/29/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3586.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3293.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3211.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (April 5 amended version corrected April 15.)
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|