|
08/31/2010
|
In Senate. Senate refuses to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 20. Noes 17. Page 5115.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 6690.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6425.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.) (August 2 amended measure version corrected August 3.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 3776.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3594.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3548.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|