|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 706, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4975.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Set for hearing August 26. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4954.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4858.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 10. Page 6518.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Heard in committee on June 21.)
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3541.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be placed on Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3311.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|