|
08/13/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3727.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3675.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3296.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|