|
08/30/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. On APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6872.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 25.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6608.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6463.) Re-referred to Com. On L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 6439.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 3790.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3675.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3307.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee. Joint Rule 61(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3209.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|