|
11/02/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 639, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
11/02/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
10/20/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
10/14/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 2522.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 6. Page 2392.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Corbett. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2392.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 3070.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 17.)
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
To Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 924.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 848.)
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 581.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on F. & A.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
To Com. on F. & A.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|