California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1402 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2010

Amended

Bill August 16, 2010
Bill June 24, 2010
Bill June 10, 2010
Bill May 18, 2010
Bill April 27, 2010
Bill March 23, 2010