|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 333, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 6339.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 3541.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3102.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|