09/27/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |||
09/25/2010 | Vetoed by Governor. | |||
09/08/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m. | |||
08/30/2010 | In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5040.) To enrollment. | |||
08/30/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6822.) To Senate. | |||
08/02/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/01/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |||
06/30/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 23.) | |||
05/19/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |||
05/13/2010 | To Com. on INS. | |||
04/29/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/29/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3378.) To Assembly. | |||
04/26/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
04/22/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3292.) | |||
03/26/2010 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
03/11/2010 | To Com. on B., F. & I. | |||
02/20/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |