|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 651, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5040.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6829.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6426.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to Senate. Placed on third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Withdrawn from enrollment. Ordered returned to Assembly for further action.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6181.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
To Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3481.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be placed on Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3292.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|