|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 334, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4946.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6330.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
To Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3379.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3292.)
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|