05/27/2010 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/21/2010 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/10/2010 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/30/2010 | Set for hearing May 10. | |||
04/22/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3304.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/13/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
03/26/2010 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
03/11/2010 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |||
02/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |