07/06/2009 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
07/02/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |||
06/08/2009 | To Com. on HUM. S. | |||
05/28/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/28/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 1036.) To Assembly. | |||
05/20/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/19/2009 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
05/08/2009 | Set for hearing May 18. | |||
05/04/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 700.) | |||
04/16/2009 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
04/13/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |||
04/02/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/23/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/12/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 14. | |||
02/11/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |