|
09/29/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4890.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6356.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 3657.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3069.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|