LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1415
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1415
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1415
Action History
06/14/2010
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
06/08/2010
Set for hearing June 23.
05/06/2010
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
04/20/2010
Set for hearing May 12.
03/11/2010
To Com. on REV. & TAX.
02/20/2010
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
02/19/2010
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.