|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 652, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4945.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6303.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6307.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6254.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.) (August 2 amended measure version corrected August 3.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 3587.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (April 28 amended version corrected May 4.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3305.)
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|