|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 527, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4651.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6056.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 3651.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3444.)
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|