|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 167, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2128.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2762.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1013.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 948.)
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 701.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 585.)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
To Coms. on EQ. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|