|
09/29/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6333.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 3701.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3676.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3211.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|