|
09/28/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/28/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 31. Page 6949.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 7. Page 3649.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3301.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|