06/15/2009 | To Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
06/03/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/03/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 17. Page 1197.) To Assembly. | |||
06/01/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1068.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/04/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/29/2009 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
04/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 678.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/21/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |||
03/27/2009 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
03/24/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 340.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |||
03/18/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
03/12/2009 | Set for hearing March 24. | |||
02/23/2009 | To Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ. | |||
02/12/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 14. | |||
02/11/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |