|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 293, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6255.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
To Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3482.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3428.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3163.)
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|